Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMID-ATLANTIC INNOCENCE PROJECT v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02112
Date Filed2023-07-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffMID-ATLANTIC INNOCENCE PROJECT
Case DescriptionThe Mid-Atlantic Innocence Project submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning Kenneth Copeland related to the 1992 murder of Wayne Edelin. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency identified 1,266 responsive pages and provided an estimated fee of $55.00 for CD releases or $58.00 for paper copies. MAIP asked for CDs. The agency put it request under the track for large requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency, MAIP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-07-201COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10219854) filed by MID-ATLANTIC INNOCENCE PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-5, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/20/2023)
2023-07-202NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of MID-ATLANTIC INNOCENCE PROJECT (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/20/2023)
2023-07-21Case Assigned to Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zcb) (Entered: 07/21/2023)
2023-07-213SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 07/21/2023)
2023-07-254STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 25, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 07/25/2023)
2023-08-205NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. McBride on behalf of All Defendants (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 08/20/2023)
2023-08-206Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 08/20/2023)
2023-08-22MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendants' 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time and DIRECTING defendants to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's 1 Complaint by October 10, 2023. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 22, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 08/22/2023)
2023-08-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Answer Or Otherwise Response To The Plaitiff's 1 Complaint due by 10/10/2023. (mac) (Entered: 08/22/2023)
2023-10-107ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 10/10/2023)
2023-10-248NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of MID-ATLANTIC INNOCENCE PROJECT (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 10/24/2023)
2023-10-249Joint STATUS REPORT by MID-ATLANTIC INNOCENCE PROJECT. (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 10/24/2023)
2023-10-25MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties, upon consideration of their 9 Joint Status Report, to file, by December 8, 2023, a joint status report, advising the Court of the status of this matter. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 25, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 10/25/2023)
2023-10-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/8/2023 (mac) (Entered: 10/26/2023)
2023-11-0710RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 8/3/2023 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/07/2023)
2023-11-0711RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 8/4/2023 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/07/2023)
2023-11-0712RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/04/2023. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/07/2023)
2023-11-0713RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/24/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/23/2023. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/07/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar