Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBOGLE v. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02030
Date Filed2023-07-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ana C. Reyes
PlaintiffCRAWFORD BOGLE
DefendantDRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-07-14Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 07/14/2023. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zcb) (Entered: 07/24/2023)
2023-07-141COMPLAINT against DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION filed by CRAWFORD BOGLE. (Attachments: # 1 APPENDIX/EXHIBIT)(zcb) (Entered: 07/24/2023)
2023-07-142MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CRAWFORD BOGLE. (zcb) (Entered: 07/24/2023)
2023-08-153ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by CRAWFORD BOGLE, 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by CRAWFORD BOGLE. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 08/15/2023. (zcb) (Entered: 08/16/2023)
2023-09-054PARTIAL PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by CRAWFORD BOGLE (Attachments: # 1 Inmate Inquiry Letter) (zcb) (Entered: 09/12/2023)
2023-11-175ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 11/17/2023. (zdp) (Entered: 11/22/2023)
2023-11-22Case Assigned to Judge Ana C. Reyes. (zdp) (Entered: 11/22/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar