Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE v. FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02159
Date Filed2023-07-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffFUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE
Case DescriptionFunctional Government Initiative submitted FOIA requests to the Federal Housing Finance Agency for records concerning the analysis of changes to FHA's loan level pricing adjustments. FGI also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, FGI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-07-251COMPLAINT against FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10230380) filed by FUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons FHFA Summons, # 3 Summons AG Summons, # 4 Summons US Atty Summons, # 5 Supplement Exhibit List, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 1, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 2, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 3, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 4)(Bartkowski, Paul) (Entered: 07/25/2023)
2023-07-26Case Assigned to Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsl) (Entered: 07/26/2023)
2023-07-262SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) (Entered: 07/26/2023)
2023-09-263NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen DeGenaro on behalf of FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 09/26/2023)
2023-09-264Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 09/26/2023)
2023-09-26MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) The Consent 4 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED; and 2) The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file its Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by October 30, 2023. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/26/2023. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 09/26/2023)
2023-09-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/30/2023. (nbn) (Entered: 09/27/2023)
2023-09-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/30/2023. (nbn) (Entered: 09/27/2023)
2023-10-305ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY.(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 10/30/2023)
2023-10-30MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by November 13, 2023. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/30/2023. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 10/30/2023)
2023-11-136Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY. (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 11/13/2023)
2023-11-13MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 6 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by December 13, 2023. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/13/2023. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 11/13/2023)
2023-11-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/13/2023. (znbn) (Entered: 11/13/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar