Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST v. FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02171
Date Filed2023-07-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffPROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST
Case DescriptionProtect the Public's Trust submitted FOIA requests to the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation for records concerning communications regarding Silicon Valley Bank between a list of FDIC commissioners and officials in the email domain @doe.gov. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after the agency failed to respond completely, PPT filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-07-261COMPLAINT against FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10232831) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA 2023-FDIC-FOIA-00327, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - FOIA 2023-FDIC-00328, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - FOIA 2023-FDIC-FOIA-00329, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons Summons - U.S. Attorney's Office, # 6 Summons Summons - U.S. Attorney General, # 7 Summons Summons - FDIC)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 07/26/2023)
2023-07-262LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 07/26/2023)
2023-07-26Case Assigned to Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zcb) (Entered: 07/26/2023)
2023-07-263SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 07/26/2023)
2023-08-014STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 1, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 08/01/2023)
2023-09-015ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION.(Smith, Herbert) (Entered: 09/01/2023)
2023-09-016NOTICE of Appearance by Herbert Grooms Smith, II on behalf of FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION (Smith, Herbert) (Entered: 09/01/2023)
2023-09-157Joint Meet and Confer Report by FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION. (Smith, Herbert) Modified docket event/text on 9/19/2023 (zed). (Entered: 09/15/2023)
2023-09-15MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties, upon consideration of their 7 Joint Status Report, to file a joint status report by November 16, 2023, advising the Court of the status of this matter and whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 15, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 09/15/2023)
2023-09-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/16/2023 (mac) (Entered: 09/18/2023)
2023-11-158Joint STATUS REPORT by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 11/15/2023)
2023-11-17MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties, upon consideration of their 8 Joint Status Report, to file, by January 19, 2024, a joint status report, advising the Court of the status of this matter. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 17, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 11/17/2023)
2023-11-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Joint Status Report due by 1/19/2024 (mac) (Entered: 11/17/2023)
2023-11-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Joint Status Report due by 1/19/2024 (mac) (Entered: 11/17/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar