Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02172
Date Filed2023-07-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffAMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionAmerica First Legal Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning the background investigation for Alejandro Mayorkas when he was nominated to head U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, and, later, the Department of Homeland Security. AFL also requested expedited processing and argued that Mayorkas' Privacy Act rights were waived when the reports were sent to Congress. The FBI acknowledged receipt of the request and denied it entirely under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). AFL filed an administrative appeal. The Office of Information Policy denied AFL's appeal. AFL then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-07-261COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10232842) filed by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Ding, Michael) (Entered: 07/26/2023)
2023-07-26Case Assigned to Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zcb) (Entered: 07/26/2023)
2023-07-262SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 07/26/2023)
2023-08-013STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 1, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 08/01/2023)
2023-08-084RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/27/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/26/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix E-mail confirmation from USADC)(Ding, Michael) (Entered: 08/08/2023)
2023-08-215RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/16/2023. (Ding, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2023)
2023-08-216RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 8/16/2023 (Ding, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2023)
2023-08-227NOTICE of Appearance by Dedra Seibel Curteman on behalf of All Defendants (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 08/22/2023)
2023-08-228Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 08/22/2023)
2023-08-23MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendants' 8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, and DIRECTING defendants to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's 1 Complaint by September 27, 2023. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 23, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 08/23/2023)
2023-08-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Answer Or Otherwise Response To Plaintiff's 1 Complaint due by 9/27/2023. (mac) (Entered: 08/24/2023)
2023-09-279ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION.(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 09/27/2023)
2023-10-1110NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Meckler on behalf of AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION (Meckler, Jacob) (Entered: 10/11/2023)
2023-10-1111Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 10/11/2023)
2023-10-12MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties, upon consideration of their 11 Joint Status Report, to file, by December 13, 2023, a joint status report, advising the Court of the status of this matter. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 12, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 10/12/2023)
2023-10-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/13/2023. (zalh) (Entered: 10/16/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar