Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-07-28 | 1 | COMPLAINT against Bureau of Indian Education ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10238329) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons for Agency, # 3 Summons Summons for US AG, # 4 Summons Summons for US Att DC)(Mercola, Monica) (Entered: 07/28/2023) |
2023-07-28 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Mercola, Monica) (Entered: 07/28/2023) |
2023-07-28 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zrtw) (Entered: 07/28/2023) |
2023-07-28 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF INDIAN EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 07/28/2023) |
2023-08-25 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of BUREAU OF INDIAN EDUCATION (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/25/2023) |
2023-08-30 | 5 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by BUREAU OF INDIAN EDUCATION. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/30/2023) |
2023-09-01 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant must answer or otherwise respond to the 1 complaint by October 3, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 09/01/2023. (lcabj2) (Entered: 09/01/2023) |
2023-10-03 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF INDIAN EDUCATION.(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/03/2023) |
2023-10-05 | 7 | ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before November 2, 2023. See Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/05/2023. (lcabj2) (Entered: 10/05/2023) |
2023-11-02 | 8 | STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN EDUCATION. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/02/2023) |
2023-11-06 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the government's 8 status report, the government is ORDERED to file another status report by December 5, 2023. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/6/2023. (lcabj2) (Entered: 11/06/2023) |
2023-12-05 | 9 | STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF INDIAN EDUCATION. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/05/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |