Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-08-02 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10248457) filed by PARADISE OCEAN CLUB LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney General, # 3 Summons US Attorney Dist. of Columbia, # 4 Summons National Park Service, # 5 Summons US Dept. of the Interior)(Garden, Kevin) (Entered: 08/02/2023) |
2023-08-02 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PARADISE OCEAN CLUB LLC (Garden, Kevin) (Entered: 08/02/2023) |
2023-08-03 | | NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to kevin@gardenlawfirm.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing/incorrect summonses. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to issue., 2. FOIA Summons' needed. (cb, ) (Entered: 08/03/2023) |
2023-08-03 | | Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zcb) (Entered: 08/03/2023) |
2023-08-03 | | NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to kevin@gardenlawfirm.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata. (cb, ) (Entered: 08/03/2023) |
2023-08-04 | 3 | STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/4/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 08/04/2023) |
2023-08-04 | 4 | ERRATA (to correct Complaint caption to include name and addresses of each party ) by PARADISE OCEAN CLUB LLC.. (Garden, Kevin) (Entered: 08/04/2023) |
2023-08-04 | 5 | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by PARADISE OCEAN CLUB LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Garden, Kevin) (Entered: 08/04/2023) |
2023-08-08 | 6 | SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjm) (Entered: 08/08/2023) |
2023-08-30 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/23/2023. (Garden, Kevin) (Entered: 08/30/2023) |
2023-08-30 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 8/22/2023 (Garden, Kevin) (Entered: 08/30/2023) |
2023-08-30 | 9 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/16/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/15/2023. (Garden, Kevin) (Entered: 08/30/2023) |
2023-08-30 | 10 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL PARK SERVICE served on 8/22/2023 (Garden, Kevin) (Entered: 08/30/2023) |
2023-09-15 | 11 | NOTICE of Appearance by Fithawi Berhane on behalf of NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Berhane, Fithawi) (Entered: 09/15/2023) |
2023-09-15 | 12 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berhane, Fithawi) (Entered: 09/15/2023) |
2023-09-15 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' consent motion for extension of time to respond, Dkt. 12 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to the complaint on or before October 16, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/15/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 09/15/2023) |
2023-10-03 | 13 | ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Berhane, Fithawi) (Entered: 10/03/2023) |
2023-10-04 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is ORDERED that, on or before October 20, 2023, the parties shall confer and file a joint status report addressing (1) any documents still to be produced pursuant to FOIA; (2) an anticipated schedule for processing and producing any such documents; and (3) any substantive areas of disagreement between the parties. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear by video for an Initial Scheduling Conference on October 27, 2023, at 2:00 p.m., before Judge Randolph D. Moss. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/4/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 10/04/2023) |
2023-10-04 | | NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Scheduling Conference RESET for 10/27/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Randolph D. Moss via video. (zglw) (Entered: 10/04/2023) |
2023-10-20 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Berhane, Fithawi) (Entered: 10/20/2023) |
2023-10-23 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 14 , the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further joint status report on or before October 27, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/23/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 10/23/2023) |
2023-10-27 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Scheduling Conference held on 10/27/2023. Joint Status Report due on or before 1/2/2024 and every 60 days after on or before the 1st business day of that month. (Court Reporter Tammi Sefranek) (zglw) (Entered: 10/27/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |