Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC. et al v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02236
Date Filed2023-08-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffNATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC.
PlaintiffTIRZAH CHRISTOPHER
PlaintiffMEG ANDERSON
Case DescriptionIn January 2022, NPR reporter Meg Anderson submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Prisons for records concerning mortality reviews for any inmate who died at Butner FCC from January 1, 2009 to the present. NPR reporter Tirzah Christopher also submitted two FOIA requests to BOP. The first request asked for budgetary details for each BOP medical facility from 2009-2021. Her second request asked for records concerning deaths in BOP facilities since January 2022. Anderson submitted a second FOIA request to BOP asking for 24-hour death notices for prisoners who died at Butner FCC from January 2018 to the present. The agency acknowledged the requests but after it failed to respond, NPR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-021COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10249516) filed by NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC.,TIRZAH CHRISTOPHER, and MEG ANDERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(DeThomas, Courtney) (Entered: 08/02/2023)
2023-08-022LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC. (DeThomas, Courtney) (Entered: 08/02/2023)
2023-08-02Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zljn) (Entered: 08/02/2023)
2023-08-023SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 08/02/2023)
2023-08-184RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS served on 8/11/2023 (DeThomas, Courtney) (Entered: 08/18/2023)
2023-08-185RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/4/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/3/2023. (DeThomas, Courtney) (Entered: 08/18/2023)
2023-08-186RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/10/2023. (DeThomas, Courtney) (Entered: 08/18/2023)
2023-08-217MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Thomas R. Burke, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10292329. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MEG ANDERSON, TIRZAH CHRISTOPHER, NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas R. Burke, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 [Proposed] Order)(DeThomas, Courtney) (Entered: 08/21/2023)
2023-08-22MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . It is hereby ORDERED that Attorney Thomas R. Burke is admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiffs. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/22/2023. (lctjk1) (Entered: 08/22/2023)
2023-08-22NOTICE OF ERROR regarding 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Thomas R. Burke, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10292329. Fee Status: Fee Paid.. The following error(s) need correction: Declaration must have an original, ink signature. Please refile using the event Declaration. (ztth) (Entered: 08/22/2023)
2023-08-238DECLARATION of Thomas R. Burke for Pro Hac Vice Admission by MEG ANDERSON, TIRZAH CHRISTOPHER, NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC. re 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Thomas R. Burke, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10292329. Fee Status: Fee Paid.. (DeThomas, Courtney) (Entered: 08/23/2023)
2023-08-239NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Burke on behalf of MEG ANDERSON, TIRZAH CHRISTOPHER, NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC. (Burke, Thomas) (Entered: 08/23/2023)
2023-08-3110NOTICE of Appearance by Dedra Seibel Curteman on behalf of All Defendants (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 08/31/2023)
2023-09-0511ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS.(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 09/05/2023)
2023-09-06MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by October 3, 2023. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/6/2023. (lctjk1) (Entered: 09/06/2023)
2023-09-2912Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 09/29/2023)
2023-10-02MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by January 2, 2024. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/2/2023. (lctjk1) (Entered: 10/02/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar