Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02267
Date Filed2023-08-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the National Archives and Records Administration for records concerning policies pertaining to the transitions of former Presidents and the help requested and/or provided to Trump in packing and moving documents. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-071COMPLAINT against NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10257868) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons National Archives and Records Admin.)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/8/2023) (zljn). (Entered: 08/07/2023)
2023-08-072ENTERED IN ERROR.....LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/8/2023) (zljn). Modified on 8/8/2023; refiled as docket entry 3 (znmw). (Entered: 08/07/2023)
2023-08-073LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (Corrected) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 08/07/2023)
2023-08-08Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zljn) (Entered: 08/08/2023)
2023-08-084SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 08/08/2023)
2023-09-055NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Joseph Wynosky on behalf of All Defendants (Wynosky, Kevin) (Entered: 09/05/2023)
2023-09-056ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION.(Wynosky, Kevin) (Entered: 09/05/2023)
2023-09-067ORDER. The parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before September 20, 2023. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/06/2023. (lcapm1) (Entered: 09/06/2023)
2023-09-118RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/8/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/7/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/014/2023., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION served on 8/11/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/11/2023)
2023-09-189Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/18/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar