Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02271
Date Filed2023-08-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning all records required to be provided to the Attorney General by the Special Counsel. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-083CIVIL COVER SHEET by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons U,S. Attorney for DC, # 2 Summons U.S. Atty General, # 3 Summons U.S. Department of Justice)(Bekesha, Michael) Modified document number on 8/9/2023 (znmw). (Entered: 08/08/2023)
2023-08-082LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 08/08/2023)
2023-08-081COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10257868) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC..(Bekesha, Michael) Modified document number on 8/9/2023 (znmw). (Entered: 08/08/2023)
2023-08-09Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zcb) (Entered: 08/09/2023)
2023-08-094SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 08/09/2023)
2023-08-165ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/16/23. (DM) (Entered: 08/16/2023)
2023-09-086NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Eiswerth on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Eiswerth, Christopher) (Entered: 09/08/2023)
2023-09-087ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Eiswerth, Christopher) (Entered: 09/08/2023)
2023-09-118ORDER instructing parties to meet and confer and file joint status report by OCTOBER 23, 2023. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/11/23. (lcckk3) (Entered: 09/11/2023)
2023-09-139RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/9/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/8/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/17/2023., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 8/17/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 09/13/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar