Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHASSAN v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02278
Date Filed2023-08-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffMUHAMMAD HASSAN
Case DescriptionMuhammed Hassan submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State concerning email correspondence between the U.S. Embassy in Islamabad, the National Visa Center and the Bureau of Consular Affairs discussing the immigrant visa backlog at the embassy in Islamabad. Hassan also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied Hassan's request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Hassan filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE The Executive Office
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-071COMPLAINT UNDER THE FREEDOM OF INFORMATION ACT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10259362) filed by MUHAMMAD HASSAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Summons AUSA DOS Garland, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Morrison, Curtis) (Entered: 08/07/2023)
2023-08-08Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsl) (Entered: 08/08/2023)
2023-08-082STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 8, 2023. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 08/08/2023)
2023-08-14NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to curtis@redeaglelaw.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing/incorrect summonses. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to issue., 2. Please use the FOIA summons at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms (zsl, ) (Entered: 08/14/2023)
2023-08-163REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by MUHAMMAD HASSAN.(Morrison, Curtis) (Entered: 08/16/2023)
2023-08-184SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (zed) (Entered: 08/18/2023)
2023-09-035RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/28/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/27/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit US Attorney, DOS, Garland)(Morrison, Curtis) Modified serve/due date on 9/5/2023 (zed). (Entered: 09/03/2023)
2023-09-146NOTICE of Appearance by M. Jared Littman on behalf of All Defendants (Littman, M.) (Entered: 09/14/2023)
2023-09-147MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Littman, M.) (Entered: 09/14/2023)
2023-09-14MINUTE ORDER. The Court grants the defendant's 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. The defendant shall answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint on or before October 18, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 14, 2023. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 09/14/2023)
2023-09-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/18/2023, (zjch, ) (Entered: 09/14/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar