Case Description | Bloomberg Industry Group, a news organization that publishes legal, tax, regulatory, and business information for professionals, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning complaints filed with the Office of Civil Rights alleging violation of Section 1557 of the Affordable Care Act. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Bloomberg Industry Group filed suit. Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees
|
Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-08-08 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10261824) filed by BLOOMBERG INDUSTRY GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Dept. of Health and Human Services)(Feder, Eric) (Entered: 08/08/2023) |
2023-08-08 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BLOOMBERG INDUSTRY GROUP, INC. (Feder, Eric) (Entered: 08/08/2023) |
2023-08-08 | 3 | NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. Feder on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Feder, Eric) (Entered: 08/08/2023) |
2023-08-08 | 4 | NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS TO COMPLAINT by BLOOMBERG INDUSTRY GROUP, INC., COURTNEY ROZEN re 1 Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Feder, Eric) (Entered: 08/08/2023) |
2023-08-09 | | NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to ericfeder@dwt.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue., 2. please correct Civil Coversheet signature and resubmit, 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (cb, ) (Entered: 08/09/2023) |
2023-08-09 | 5 | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to US Attorney General filed by BLOOMBERG INDUSTRY GROUP, INC., COURTNEY ROZEN. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by BLOOMBERG INDUSTRY GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons to US Attorney)(Feder, Eric) (Entered: 08/09/2023) |
2023-08-09 | 6 | CIVIL COVER SHEET by BLOOMBERG INDUSTRY GROUP, INC., COURTNEY ROZEN re 1 Complaint, filed by BLOOMBERG INDUSTRY GROUP, INC., COURTNEY ROZEN. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by BLOOMBERG INDUSTRY GROUP, INC..(Feder, Eric) (Entered: 08/09/2023) |
2023-08-09 | | Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (zcb) (Entered: 08/09/2023) |
2023-08-09 | 7 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 08/09/2023) |
2023-09-14 | 8 | NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen DeGenaro on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 09/14/2023) |
2023-09-14 | 9 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 09/14/2023) |
2023-09-14 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond: Defendant is hereby ORDERED to file answer to the Complaint in this matter by October 13, 2023. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on September 14, 2023. (lcjmc1) (Entered: 09/14/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |
|