Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNash v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2023cv06994
Date Filed2023-08-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John P. Cronan
PlaintiffLindsay Nash
Case DescriptionLindsay Nash, co-dir4ector of the Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice at the Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning administrative subpoenas issued by ICE employees. Nash also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. ICE involved a 10-day extension. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Nash filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-081COMPLAINT against U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28121116)Document filed by Lindsay Nash. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Dec. 7, 2022 FOIA Request), # 2 Exhibit B (SecureRelease Portal Page), # 3 Exhibit C (Dec. 7, 2022 Email to ICE), # 4 Exhibit D (ICE Acknowledgement Letter)).(Nash, Lindsay) (Entered: 08/08/2023)
2023-08-082CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Nash, Lindsay) (Entered: 08/08/2023)
2023-08-083STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-4288 (JPC). Document filed by Lindsay Nash..(Nash, Lindsay) (Entered: 08/08/2023)
2023-08-09CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc) (Entered: 08/09/2023)
2023-08-09Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 08/09/2023)
2023-08-09CASE REFERRED TO Judge John P. Cronan as possibly related to 21cv4288. (pc) (Entered: 08/09/2023)
2023-08-09***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lindsay C. Nash. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Lindsay Nash, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc) (Entered: 08/09/2023)
2023-08-11CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-04288-JPC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (sgz) (Entered: 08/11/2023)
2023-08-11NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John P. Cronan. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sgz) (Entered: 08/11/2023)
2023-08-11Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (sgz) (Entered: 08/11/2023)
2023-08-155REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement,, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Lindsay Nash..(Nash, Lindsay) (Entered: 08/15/2023)
2023-08-166ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (vf) (Entered: 08/16/2023)
2023-09-187AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 8/23/2023. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Lindsay Nash. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Certified Mail Receipts)).(Nash, Lindsay) (Entered: 09/18/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar