Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleVan Der Hout et al v. Executive Office for Immigration Review (EOIR) et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2023cv04036
Date Filed2023-08-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Laurel Beeler
PlaintiffMarc Van Der Hout
PlaintiffVan Der Hout LLP
PlaintiffHarjinder Pannu
Case DescriptionMarc van der Hout, an immigration attorney, submitted a FOIA request to the Executive Office for Immigration Review for records concerning the record of proceedings for Harjinder Kaur Pannu, his client. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency responded in part, disclosing 66 pages, but failed to release others. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Van der Hout filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantExecutive Office for Immigration Review (EOIR)
DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-091COMPLAINT against Executive Office for Immigration Review (EOIR), U.S. Department of Justice ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18530638.). Filed byMarc Van Der Hout, Harjinder Pannu, Van Der Hout LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Declaration Authenticating Declaration with Exhibits)(Sinodis, John) (Filed on 8/9/2023) (Entered: 08/09/2023)
2023-08-092Proposed Summons. (Sinodis, John) (Filed on 8/9/2023) (Entered: 08/09/2023)
2023-08-103Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/24/2023. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2023) (Entered: 08/10/2023)
2023-08-104Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/2/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2023 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2023) (Entered: 08/10/2023)
2023-08-105Summons Issued as to Executive Office for Immigration Review (EOIR), U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2023) (Entered: 08/10/2023)
2023-08-106Certificate of Interested Entities by Harjinder Pannu, Marc Van Der Hout, Van Der Hout LLP (Sinodis, John) (Filed on 8/10/2023) (Entered: 08/10/2023)
2023-08-157CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Harjinder Pannu, Marc Van Der Hout, Van Der Hout LLP.. (Sinodis, John) (Filed on 8/15/2023) (Entered: 08/15/2023)
2023-08-178AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Conformed Summonses; Authenticating Declaration with Exhibits; Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference; Disclosure of Conflicts and Interested Entities or Persons; Notice of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge; Standing Order; Court Call Procedures; Exhibit List; Standing Order for All Judges; and ECF Registration Handout served on Civil Process Clock at U.S. Attorney's Office for the Northern District of California; Executive Office for Immigration Review; U.S. Department of Justice on 08/17/2023, filed by Harjinder Pannu, Marc Van Der Hout, Van Der Hout LLP. (Sinodis, John) (Filed on 8/17/2023) (Entered: 08/17/2023)
2023-08-179CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Harjinder Pannu, Marc Van Der Hout, Van Der Hout LLP (Sinodis, John) (Filed on 8/17/2023) (Entered: 08/17/2023)
2023-08-2010CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Executive Office for Immigration Review (EOIR), U.S. Department of Justice.. (Wolinsky, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/20/2023) (Entered: 08/20/2023)
2023-09-0811STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Executive Office for Immigration Review (EOIR), U.S. Department of Justice. (Wolinsky, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/8/2023) (Entered: 09/08/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar