Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMaritime Legal Solutions, PLLC v. U.S. Transportation Command
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2023cv07045
Date Filed2023-08-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Katherine Polk Failla
PlaintiffMaritime Legal Solutions, PLLC
Case DescriptionMaritime Legal Solutions submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Transportation Command for records concerning incidents of sexual abuse. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency gave MLS an estimated completion time but after hearing nothing further from the agency, MLS filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Transportation Command
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-091COMPLAINT against U.S. Transportation Command. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28127401)Document filed by Maritime Legal Solutions, PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit B: FOIA Acknowledgment, # 3 Exhibit C: Estimated Completion Date (ECD) Request, # 4 Exhibit D: TRANSCOM Response to ECD Request, # 5 Exhibit E: TRANSCOM ECD Follow Up).(Melogy, John) (Entered: 08/09/2023)
2023-08-092CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Melogy, John) (Entered: 08/09/2023)
2023-08-093FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Maritime Legal Solutions, PLLC..(Melogy, John) (Entered: 08/09/2023)
2023-08-094REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. TRANSPORTATION COMMAND, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maritime Legal Solutions, PLLC..(Melogy, John) (Entered: 08/09/2023)
2023-08-10***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John Ryan Melogy. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc) (Entered: 08/10/2023)
2023-08-10CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(pc) (Entered: 08/10/2023)
2023-08-10Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (pc) (Entered: 08/10/2023)
2023-08-10Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 08/10/2023)
2023-08-105ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Transportation Command..(pc) (Entered: 08/10/2023)
2023-08-106FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Adria G. Notari to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28133551. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Maritime Legal Solutions, PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in support of pro hac vice admission per Local Rule 1.3, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order text of proposed order).(Notari, Adria) Modified on 8/11/2023 (va). (Entered: 08/10/2023)
2023-08-11>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 6 MOTION for Adria G. Notari to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28133551. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Florida. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (va) (Entered: 08/11/2023)
2023-08-167NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 11/14/2023 at 10:30 AM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/16/2023) (jca) (Entered: 08/16/2023)
2023-08-218NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Anthony Pantoja on behalf of U.S. Transportation Command..(Pantoja, Joseph) (Entered: 08/21/2023)
2023-08-259AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint, served. U.S. Transportation Command served on 8/17/2023, answer due 9/18/2023. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Maritime Legal Solutions, PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavidt of Service to SDNY, # 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Service to US Attorney General).(Melogy, John) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
2023-09-1410FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from AUSA Joseph A. Pantoja dated September 14, 2023. Document filed by U.S. Transportation Command..(Pantoja, Joseph) (Entered: 09/14/2023)
2023-09-1511ORDER: granting 10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 10 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from AUSA Joseph A. Pantoja dated September 14, 2023. Application GRANTED. Defendant shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before October 17, 2023. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket number 10. SO ORDERED. U.S. Transportation Command answer due 10/17/2023. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/15/2023) (ama) (Entered: 09/15/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar