Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRyder v. Edwards et al
DistrictEastern District of Virginia
CityRichmond
Case Number3:2023cv00501
Date Filed2023-08-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Roderick C. Young
PlaintiffR. Randall Ryder, Jr. PhD
Case DescriptionRandall Ryder submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Defense for records about himself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Ryder filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDavid P. Edwards DSS Investigator
DefendantDSS/DCSA
DefendantARBA/BCMR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-091COMPLAINT against ARBA/BCMR, DSS/DCSA, David P. Edwards (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 300001980.) filed by R. Randall Ryder, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Local Rule 83.1(M) Certification)(Kat) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/9/2023) (Kat, ). (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/14/2023. Addendum added to Complaint and summons package.) (smej, ). (Entered: 08/09/2023)
2023-08-092Summons Issued as to David P. Edwards, ARBA/BCMR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, DSS/DCSA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Kat) (Entered: 08/09/2023)
2023-08-313NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Tyler Lucier on behalf of ARBA/BCMR, DSS/DCSA, David P. Edwards (Lucier, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/31/2023)
2023-09-194SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Attorney General and U.S. Attorney by R. Randall Ryder, Jr. (Kat) (Entered: 09/19/2023)
2023-09-195Summons Returned Unexecuted as to ARBA/BCMR, DSS/DCSA, David P. Edwards. (Kat) (Entered: 09/19/2023)
2023-09-196MOTION for Consideration by R. Randall Ryder, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Local Rule 83.1(M) Certification)(Kat) (Entered: 09/19/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar