Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST v. U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02322
Date Filed2023-08-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffPROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST
Case DescriptionProtect the Public's Trust submitted a FOIA request to the FDA for records concerning user fees submitted to the FDA's Center for Biologics Evaluation and Research from COVID-19 vaccines and how those fees were used. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PPT filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-101COMPLAINT against U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10268610) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA Request, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney's Office, # 4 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons Summons - FDA)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 08/10/2023)
2023-08-102LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 08/10/2023)
2023-08-11Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zcb) (Entered: 08/11/2023)
2023-08-113SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 08/11/2023)
2023-08-114STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 11, 2023. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 08/11/2023)
2023-09-155ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION.(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 09/15/2023)
2023-09-15MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before October 6, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 15, 2023. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 09/15/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar