Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE v. U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02323
Date Filed2023-08-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ana C. Reyes
PlaintiffFUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE
Case DescriptionFunctional Government Initiative submitted two FOIA requests to the FDA for records. The first FOIA request asked for correspondence between certain officials in the FDA's Center for Tobacco Products and a list of named organizations. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. FGI and the agency had discussions about clarifying the scope of the request but FGI heard nothing further. The second FOIA asked for records concerning correspondence between to named officials in the FDA's Office of Food Policy and Response and a list of named organizations. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, FGI filed suit on both requests.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-101COMPLAINT against U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10269183) filed by FUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 08/10/2023)
2023-08-11Case Assigned to Judge Ana C. Reyes. (zrtw) (Entered: 08/11/2023)
2023-08-112REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by FUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by FUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 08/11/2023)
2023-08-143SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 08/14/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar