Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleUS Right to Know v. Office of the Director of National Intelligence
DistrictEastern District of Virginia
CityAlexandria
Case Number1:2023cv01055
Date Filed2023-08-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge T. S. Ellis, III
PlaintiffUS Right to Know
Case DescriptionU.S. Right to Know submitted a FOIA request to the Office of the Director of National Intelligence for records concerning the origin of the COIVD-19 pandemic. U.S. Right to Know also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, USRTK filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOffice of the Director of National Intelligence
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-101Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-9071190.), filed by US Right to Know. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (FOIA Request), # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 08/10/2023)
2023-08-102Proposed Summons re 1 Complaint directed to ODNI General Counsel by US Right to Know. (Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 08/10/2023)
2023-08-103Proposed Summons re 1 Complaint directed to Attorney General by US Right to Know. (Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 08/10/2023)
2023-08-104Proposed Summons re 1 Complaint directed to US Attorney (Civil Process Clerk) by US Right to Know. (Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 08/10/2023)
2023-08-10Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (dvanm) (Entered: 08/10/2023)
2023-08-105Summons Issued as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA. (Attachments: # 1 Notice)(dvanm) (Entered: 08/10/2023)
2023-09-086Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Levenson, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/08/2023)
2023-09-127ORDERED that Defendant's 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File is GRANTED ; and it is further ORDERED that Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's complaint on or before October 2, 2023 . Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 09/12/2023. (Dcrow, ) (Entered: 09/12/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar