Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02324
Date Filed2023-08-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning the agency's dataset for Land Health provided to PEER in response to FOIA requests in 2007, 2012, and 2020. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-111COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10269886) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons for Agency, # 3 Summons Summons for AG, # 4 Summons Summons for USATTY DC)(Mercola, Monica) (Entered: 08/11/2023)
2023-08-112LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Mercola, Monica) (Entered: 08/11/2023)
2023-08-11Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zrtw) (Entered: 08/11/2023)
2023-08-143SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 08/14/2023)
2023-09-114STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 11, 2023. (lccjn2) (Entered: 09/11/2023)
2023-09-125RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General August 18, 2023., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/16/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/15/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 8/18/2023 (Mercola, Monica) (Entered: 09/12/2023)
2023-09-156ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Robertson, L'Shauntee) (Entered: 09/15/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar