Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleVANDA PHARMACEUTICALS INC. v. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02325
Date Filed2023-08-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffVANDA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Case DescriptionVanda Pharmaceuticals submitted a FOIA request to the FDA for records concerning discipline reviews prepared by the agency during the evaluation of NDA 205677/S-005. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Vanda Pharmaceuticals filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-111COMPLAINT against FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10269977) filed by VANDA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hughes, Paul) (Entered: 08/11/2023)
2023-08-11Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zljn) (Entered: 08/11/2023)
2023-08-112SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 08/11/2023)
2023-08-143LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by VANDA PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (Hughes, Paul) (Entered: 08/14/2023)
2023-08-184RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/14/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/13/2023. (Hughes, Paul) (Entered: 08/18/2023)
2023-09-085NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Silverman on behalf of FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 09/08/2023)
2023-09-136ANSWER to Complaint by FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION.(Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 09/13/2023)
2023-09-14MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant must file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before October 13, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/14/2023.(lcabj1) (Entered: 09/14/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar