Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleVANDA PHARMACEUTICALS INC. v. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02326
Date Filed2023-08-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffVANDA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Case DescriptionVanda Pharmaceuticals submitted a FOIA request to the FDA for records concerning SOPs or other internal guidance concerning the agency's triage, prioritization, or processing of incoming FOIA requests. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Vanda Pharmaceuticals filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-111COMPLAINT against FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10270102) filed by VANDA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hughes, Paul) (Entered: 08/11/2023)
2023-08-11Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zljn) (Entered: 08/11/2023)
2023-08-112SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 08/11/2023)
2023-08-143LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by VANDA PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (Hughes, Paul) (Entered: 08/14/2023)
2023-08-184RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/14/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/13/2023. (Hughes, Paul) (Entered: 08/18/2023)
2023-09-115NOTICE of Appearance by L'Shauntee J. Robertson on behalf of FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION (Robertson, L'Shauntee) (Entered: 09/11/2023)
2023-09-116GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 11, 2023. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 09/11/2023)
2023-09-127MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Robertson, L'Shauntee) (Entered: 09/12/2023)
2023-09-13MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 7 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, it is hereby ORDERED that the 7 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that, on or before October 13, 2023, the defendant shall file its answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 13, 2023. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 09/13/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar