Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFranklin v. Wormuth
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityGreenbelt
Case Number8:2023cv02129
Date Filed2023-08-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Paula Xinis
PlaintiffRita Rene Franklin
Case DescriptionRita Rene Franklin, an employee alleging sexual harassment, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Army for records concerning the agency's investigation report into her sexual harassment allegations. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Franklin filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantChristine Wormuth Secretary of the Army
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-071COMPLAINT against Christine Wormuth ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 1270.), filed by Rita Rene Franklin. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/07/2023)
2023-08-072Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Rita Rene Franklin. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/07/2023)
2023-08-073New Case Notification Letter sent to Rita Rene Franklin. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/07/2023)
2023-08-254ORDER directing Plaintiff to submit completed summons within 21 days. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 8/25/2023. (c/mw forms 8/25/2023 ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
2023-08-305Summons Issued 60 days as to Christine Wormuth, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/30/2023)
2023-09-146SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rita Rene Franklin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/14/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar