Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleUS Right to Know v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2023cv04120
Date Filed2023-08-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Peter H Kang
PlaintiffUS Right to Know
Case DescriptionU.S. Right to Know submitted two FOIA requests to the Centers for Disease Control for records. The first FOIA request asked for records concerning government efforts to understand the origins of the 2014-2016 Ebola epidemic in West Africa. USTRK also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told USTRK that its request was too burdensome to search. USTRK's second FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning a former HHS employee. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to either request, USTRK filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Health and Human Services
DefendantU.S. Centers for Disease Control and Prevention
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-141COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18544240). Filed by US Right to Know. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rivo, Lily) (Filed on 8/14/2023) Modified on 8/15/2023 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/14/2023)
2023-08-142Proposed Summons. (Attachments: # 1 A to Summons HHS)(Rivo, Lily) (Filed on 8/14/2023) (Entered: 08/14/2023)
2023-08-143Proposed Summons. (Attachments: # 1 A to Summons CDC)(Rivo, Lily) (Filed on 8/14/2023) (Entered: 08/14/2023)
2023-08-144Corporate Disclosure Statement by US Right to Know (Rivo, Lily) (Filed on 8/14/2023) (Entered: 08/14/2023)
2023-08-145Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/28/2023. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2023) (Entered: 08/15/2023)
2023-08-156Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2023 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2023) (Entered: 08/15/2023)
2023-08-157Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2023) (Entered: 08/15/2023)
2023-08-158Summons Issued as to U.S. Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2023) (Entered: 08/15/2023)
2023-08-249SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Right to Know. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services served on 8/24/2023, answer due 10/23/2023. For the Attorney General of the United States (Blome, Jessica) (Filed on 8/24/2023) (Entered: 08/24/2023)
2023-08-2410SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Right to Know. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services served on 8/23/2023, answer due 10/23/2023. For the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services (Blome, Jessica) (Filed on 8/24/2023) (Entered: 08/24/2023)
2023-08-2811SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by US Right to Know. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services served on 8/18/2023, answer due 10/23/2023. To the U.S. Attorney's Office (Blome, Jessica) (Filed on 8/28/2023) (Entered: 08/28/2023)
2023-08-2812SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by US Right to Know. U.S. Centers for Disease Control and Prevention served on 8/24/2023, answer due 9/25/2023. To the U.S. Attorney General (Blome, Jessica) (Filed on 8/28/2023) (Entered: 08/28/2023)
2023-08-2813SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by US Right to Know. U.S. Centers for Disease Control and Prevention served on 8/21/2023, answer due 9/25/2023. To the U.S. CDC (Blome, Jessica) (Filed on 8/28/2023) (Entered: 08/28/2023)
2023-08-2814SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by US Right to Know. U.S. Centers for Disease Control and Prevention served on 8/18/2023, answer due 9/25/2023. To the U.S. Attorney's Office (Blome, Jessica) (Filed on 8/28/2023) (Entered: 08/28/2023)
2023-08-2915CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by US Right to Know.. (Rivo, Lily) (Filed on 8/29/2023) (Entered: 08/29/2023)
2023-09-0116CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms . (Parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 9/15/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jaf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2023) (Entered: 09/01/2023)
2023-09-0617STIPULATION to Continue Response Deadline filed by U.S. Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Friend, Molly) (Filed on 9/6/2023) (Entered: 09/06/2023)
2023-09-1518NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Jessica Blome to Rachel S. Doughty (Blome, Jessica) (Filed on 9/15/2023) (Entered: 09/15/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar