Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMUHLE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02353
Date Filed2023-08-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffSTEVEN MUHLE
Case DescriptionSteven Muhle submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning his job application file. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Muhle filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-141COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10275860) filed by STEVEN MUHLE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/14/2023)
2023-08-142SEALED DOCUMENT filed by STEVEN MUHLE(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/14/2023)
2023-08-143NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of STEVEN MUHLE (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/14/2023)
2023-08-15Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zrtw) (Entered: 08/15/2023)
2023-08-154SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 08/15/2023)
2023-09-145ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Moustakas, John) (Entered: 09/14/2023)
2023-09-15MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by September 29, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/15/2023. (lccrc1) (Entered: 09/15/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar