Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02357
Date Filed2023-08-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffPROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST
Case DescriptionProtect the Public's Trust submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning public comments the lodging of a consent decree for a Superfund clean-up site in New Jersey. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PPT filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-151COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10277693) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA Request, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney's Office, # 4 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons Summons - DOJ)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 08/15/2023)
2023-08-152LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 08/15/2023)
2023-08-15Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zljn) (Entered: 08/15/2023)
2023-08-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 08/15/2023)
2023-09-154Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/15/2023)
2023-09-155GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 15, 2023. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 09/15/2023)
2023-09-15MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's 4 Motion to Enlarge Time to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant's 4 Motion to Enlarge Time to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that, on or before October 17, 2023, the defendant shall respond to the plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 15, 2023. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 09/15/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar