Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMalone v. United States Patent and Trademark Office
DistrictEastern District of Virginia
CityAlexandria
Case Number1:2023cv01075
Date Filed2023-08-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Claude M. Hilton
PlaintiffJosh Malone
Case DescriptionJosh Malone submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office for records. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency originally charged Malone $1,830 in fees, which he paid. However, the fees were returned when the agency agreed to process the request without fees. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Malone filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Fees - Commitment to pay, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Patent and Trademark Office
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-151Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-9077139.), filed by JOSH MALONE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richins, Travis) (Entered: 08/15/2023)
2023-08-152Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Joshua White and Certification of Local Counsel Travis Richins Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9077191. by JOSH MALONE. (Richins, Travis) (Entered: 08/15/2023)
2023-08-153Proposed Summons by JOSH MALONE. (Richins, Travis) (Entered: 08/15/2023)
2023-08-15Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (dvanm) (Entered: 08/16/2023)
2023-08-16Notice of Correction re 3 Proposed Summons. The filing user has been notified to submit proposed summons for the USAO and Attorney General. (dvanm) (Entered: 08/16/2023)
2023-08-164Proposed Summons to the US Attorney General by Josh Malone. (Richins, Travis) (Entered: 08/16/2023)
2023-08-165Proposed Summons on the US Attorney's Office for the EDVA by Josh Malone. (Richins, Travis) (Entered: 08/16/2023)
2023-08-186Summons Issued as to United States Patent and Trademark Office, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA. (Attachments: # 1 Notice)(dvanm) (Entered: 08/18/2023)
2023-09-207ANSWER to Complaint by United States Patent and Trademark Office.(Wesnousky, Carolyn) (Entered: 09/20/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar