Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST v. U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02378
Date Filed2023-08-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Loren L. AliKhan
PlaintiffPROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST
Case DescriptionProtect the Public's Trust submitted two FOIA requests to the FDA for records. The first FOIA request asked for records concerning communications between a list of FDA officials and a list of advocacy groups. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The second FOIA request asked for communications between a list of advocacy groups and named officials at the FDA. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to either request, PPT filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-161COMPLAINT against U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10280189) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Request 2023-3161, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Request 2023-3162, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney's Office, # 5 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney General, # 6 Summons Summons - FDA)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 08/16/2023)
2023-08-162LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 08/16/2023)
2023-08-16Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsl) (Entered: 08/16/2023)
2023-08-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) (Entered: 08/16/2023)
2023-09-294ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION.(Robertson, L'Shauntee) (Entered: 09/29/2023)
2023-10-025GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 2, 2023. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 10/02/2023)
2023-10-02MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before October 30, 2023, the parties shall file a joint proposed briefing schedule governing further proceedings. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 2, 2023. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 10/02/2023)
2023-10-306Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Robertson, L'Shauntee) (Entered: 10/30/2023)
2023-11-01MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 6 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before December 14, 2023, the parties shall file an additional joint status report regarding how they wish to proceed in this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 1, 2023. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 11/01/2023)
2023-12-147Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Robertson, L'Shauntee) (Entered: 12/14/2023)
2023-12-14Case directly reassigned to Judge Loren L. AliKhan. Judge Reggie B. Walton is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 12/14/2023)
2024-01-02MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report 7 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before January 29, 2024. Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 01/02/2024. (lclla3) (Entered: 01/02/2024)
2024-01-08Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 1/29/2024. (zcdw) (Entered: 01/08/2024)
2024-01-298Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Robertson, L'Shauntee) (Entered: 01/29/2024)
2024-01-30MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report 8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before March 29, 2024. If the parties seek a status conference in that report, they should propose three mutually agreeable dates. Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 01/30/2024. (lclla3) (Entered: 01/30/2024)
2024-01-31Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 3/29/2024. (zcdw) (Entered: 01/31/2024)
2024-03-299Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Robertson, L'Shauntee) (Entered: 03/29/2024)
2024-04-01MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report 9 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before May 29, 2024. Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 04/01/2024. (lclla3) (Entered: 04/01/2024)
2024-04-04Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 5/29/2024. (zcdw) (Entered: 04/04/2024)
2024-05-2910Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Robertson, L'Shauntee) (Entered: 05/29/2024)
2024-05-29MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report 10 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before July 29, 2024. Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 05/29/2024. (lclla3) (Entered: 05/29/2024)
2024-05-29Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 7/29/2024. (zcdw) (Entered: 05/29/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar