Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePOWER THE FUTURE v. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02380
Date Filed2023-08-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffPOWER THE FUTURE
Case DescriptionPower the Future submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning certain described email correspondence of three named EPA Region X political appointees using one or more of six named email domains of environmental groups. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency disclosed some records but redacted some records under Exemption 5 (privileges) and Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). Power the Future filed an administrative appeal of two emails redacted under Exemption 5. The agency released one email in full but continued to redact portions of the other email. Power the Future then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-161COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10280402) filed by POWER THE FUTURE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (redacted record), # 2 Exhibit B (correspondence), # 3 Summons to EPA, # 4 Summons to USAG, # 5 Summons, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 08/16/2023)
2023-08-172NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of POWER THE FUTURE (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 08/17/2023)
2023-08-17Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsl) (Entered: 08/17/2023)
2023-08-183SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 08/18/2023)
2023-08-234NOTICE of Appearance by B. Kathryn Debrason on behalf of U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Debrason, B.) (Entered: 08/23/2023)
2023-09-155MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Truong, John) (Entered: 09/15/2023)
2023-09-18MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's 5 Motion for Extension of Time is hereby GRANTED. Defendant shall have through October 18, 2023 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint in this action. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 09/18/2023. (lcd) (Entered: 09/18/2023)
2023-09-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Answer due by 10/18/2023. (zed) (Entered: 09/19/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar