Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-08-16 | 1 | COMPLAINT against FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRAION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16882304.), filed by Daniel Auerbach. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (A - C: Acknowledgment, CMV Response Letter, Udapi Email), # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Designation Form)(AUERBACH, DANIEL) (Entered: 08/16/2023) |
2023-08-16 | 2 | Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney GeneraL. E-mailed to U.S. Attorney's Office on 8/16/23 (fdc) (Entered: 08/16/2023) |
2023-08-16 | 3 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by DANIEL J. AUERBACH re: Daniel J. Auerbach served Summons and Complaint upon UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION by Personal (USAO); certified mail (AG, FDA). UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION served on 8/16/2023. (AUERBACH, DANIEL) Modified on 8/17/2023 (lisad, ). (Entered: 08/16/2023) |
2023-08-16 | 4 | NOTICE by DANIEL J. AUERBACH re 1 Complaint (Attorney), withdrawing and replacing exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (FDA Acknowledgment), # 2 Exhibit B (CVM Final Response), # 3 Exhibit C (Udapi email))(AUERBACH, DANIEL) (Entered: 08/16/2023) |
2023-09-14 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Isaac Jonathan Jean-Pierre on behalf of UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION with Certificate of Service(Jean-Pierre, Isaac) (Entered: 09/14/2023) |
2023-09-14 | 6 | NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD B. SULLIVAN on behalf of UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION with Certificate of Service(SULLIVAN, GERALD) (Entered: 09/14/2023) |
2023-09-15 | 7 | DEFENDANT FDA'S ANSWER to Complaint and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION.(Jean-Pierre, Isaac) (Entered: 09/15/2023) |
2023-09-19 | 8 | ORDER THAT LEAD COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES SHALL APPEAR FOR A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 10, 2023 AT 11:00 AM, IN CHAMBERS ROOM 12613, BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON. FURTHER INFORMATION AND DEADLINES AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 9/19/2023. 9/19/2023 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja) (Entered: 09/19/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |