Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDOBKIN v. U.S. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02395
Date Filed2023-08-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffADIN DOBKIN
Case DescriptionAdin Dobkin, a journalist, submitted a FOIA request to the National Archives and Records Administration for records concerning Albert Bacon Fall, who was investigated by the FBI in 1925 pertaining to allegations that he had sent a money transfer to Mexican nationals to launch raids into the United States. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Dobkin in had located 862 responsive pages and if Dobkin could narrow the scope of the request to come below 700 pages, it would take 39 months to process. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Dobkin filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
DefendantU.S. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-171COMPLAINT against NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10284154) filed by ADIN T. DOBKIN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons (x3))(Kane, Maya) (Entered: 08/17/2023)
2023-08-18Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zrtw) (Entered: 08/18/2023)
2023-08-18NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to mkane@swpropertylaw.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing/incorrect summonses. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to issue. (zrtw, ) (Entered: 08/18/2023)
2023-08-182REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Corrected filed by ADIN DOBKIN. Related document: Notice of QC- New Case, 1 Complaint filed by ADIN DOBKIN.(Kane, Maya) (Entered: 08/18/2023)
2023-08-213SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(ztth) (Entered: 08/21/2023)
2023-09-214ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION.(Robertson, L'Shauntee) (Entered: 09/21/2023)
2023-09-22MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before October 20, 2023, the parties shall file a joint proposed briefing schedule governing further proceedings. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 22, 2023. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 09/22/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar