Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTHE ESTATE OF MRS EVA R BUENAVENTURA v. EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT et al
DistrictDistrict of Maine
CityPortland
Case Number2:2023cv00325
Date Filed2023-08-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJUDGE JON D. LEVY
PlaintiffTHE ESTATE OF MRS EVA R BUENAVENTURA C/O IAN R BUENAVENTURA
Case DescriptionThe Estate of Mrs. Eva R. Buenventura filed suit against the U.S. government. This is not a FOIA case.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT THE WHITE HOUSE
DefendantHONORABLE LLOYD J AUSTIN, III SECRETARY OF DEFENSE
DefendantJOHN DOES 1-10
DefendantJANE DOES 1-10
DefendantLEGAL ENTITIES 1-10
DefendantFOREIGN NATIONS 1-10
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-201COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. , filed by THE ESTATE OF MRS EVA R BUENAVENTURA. (Service of Process Deadline 11/20/2023) Fee due by 8/22/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Endnotes Email 2, # 2 Endnotes Email 3, # 3 Email 1 of 3 Received 8/20/2023 to ECF Inbox, # 4 Email 2 of 3 Received 8/20/2023 to ECF Inbox, # 5 Email 3 of 3 Received 8/20/2023 to ECF Inbox)(clp) (Entered: 08/21/2023)
2023-08-202CIVIL COVER SHEET. (clp) (Entered: 08/21/2023)
2023-08-21Filing Fee Received from THE ESTATE OF MRS EVA R BUENAVENTURA: Amount Paid: $402.00. Receipt Number: 2517. Method of Payment: Credit Card. Purpose of Payment: Case Opening Filing Fee. Date Paid: 8/21/2023 (clp) (Entered: 08/21/2023)
2023-08-213NOTICE: Recently THE ESTATE OF MRS EVA R BUENAVENTURA filed a pleading in this Court without representation of an attorney. Information regarding representing yourself is available on the Court's website at https://www.med.uscourts.gov/handout-self-represented-parties including a Handout for Self-Represented Parties. This handout is intended for informational and practical purposes only and in no way takes the place of an attorney's legal advice, but it may provide some answers to procedural and general questions. ALSO NOTE: You are responsible for notifying the Court in writing of any changes to your mailing address or telephone number and of any change in status regarding representation by an attorney. (cc: pro se litigant) (clp) (Entered: 08/21/2023)
2023-08-214Summons Issued as to EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT, LLOYD J AUSTIN, III. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: # 1 Summons-Austin)(clp) (Entered: 08/21/2023)
2023-08-215MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by THE ESTATE OF MRS EVA R BUENAVENTURA. No PDF document attached to filing. To view PDF see ECF 1 Complaint. (clp) (Entered: 08/21/2023)
2023-08-246ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS ( ADDITIONAL ENDNOTES) filed by THE ESTATE OF MRS EVA R BUENAVENTURA re 1 Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Email Received 8/24/2023 to ECF Inbox)(clp) (Entered: 08/24/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar