Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-08-21 | 1 | COMPLAINT against United States Department of State ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18567739.). Filed byJewish Legal News, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 8/21/2023) (Entered: 08/21/2023) |
2023-08-21 | 2 | Proposed Summons. (Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 8/21/2023) (Entered: 08/21/2023) |
2023-08-21 | 3 | Proposed Summons. (Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 8/21/2023) (Entered: 08/21/2023) |
2023-08-21 | 4 | Civil Cover Sheet by Jewish Legal News, Inc. . (Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 8/21/2023) (Entered: 08/21/2023) |
2023-08-21 | 5 | CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jewish Legal News, Inc... (Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 8/21/2023) (Entered: 08/21/2023) |
2023-08-21 | 6 | Certificate of Interested Entities by Jewish Legal News, Inc. (none) (Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 8/21/2023) (Entered: 08/21/2023) |
2023-08-22 | 7 | Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/5/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2023) (Entered: 08/22/2023) |
2023-08-22 | 8 | Summons Issued as to United States Department of State, U.S. Attorney (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2023) (Entered: 08/22/2023) |
2023-08-22 | 9 | Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/13/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2023) (Entered: 08/22/2023) |
2023-08-24 | 10 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jewish Legal News, Inc.. US Attorney served on 8/24/2023, answer due 10/23/2023. (Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 8/24/2023) (Entered: 08/24/2023) |
2023-08-26 | 11 | SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by Jewish Legal News, Inc.. United States Department of State served on 8/25/2023, answer due 9/25/2023. (Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 8/26/2023) (Entered: 08/26/2023) |
2023-09-22 | 12 | Summons Returned Unexecuted by Jewish Legal News, Inc. as to United States Department of State. (Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 9/22/2023) (Entered: 09/22/2023) |
2023-09-22 | 13 | NOTICE of Appearance by Shiwon Choe for U.S. Department of State (Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 9/22/2023) (Entered: 09/22/2023) |
2023-09-22 | 14 | ANSWER to Complaint byUnited States Department of State. (Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 9/22/2023) (Entered: 09/22/2023) |
2023-09-22 | 15 | CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Department of State.. (Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 9/22/2023) (Entered: 09/22/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |