Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHolmes v. Department of Homeland Security
DistrictDistrict of New Mexico
CityLas Cruces
Case Number2:2023cv00702
Date Filed2023-08-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea
PlaintiffRichard B Holmes
Case DescriptionRichard Holmes submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning an investigation of Holmes when he was a Border Patrol Agent. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Holmes filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-221COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief (FOIA) against Department of Homeland Security ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Richard B Holmes. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Wheeler, John) (Entered: 08/22/2023)
2023-08-22United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (bc) (Entered: 08/22/2023)
2023-08-232Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number ANMDC-8971965 re 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief (FOIA) against Department of Homeland Security ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Richard B Holmes. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Wheeler, John) filed by Richard B Holmes (arp) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 08/24/2023)
2023-08-29Summons Issued as to Department of Homeland Security c/o Hon. Alexander M.M. Uballez United States Attorney for the District of New Mexico PO Box 607 Albuquerque, NM 87103 (bc) (Entered: 08/29/2023)
2023-09-153NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Lucero on behalf of Department of Homeland Security (Lucero, Manuel) (Entered: 09/15/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar