Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT v. UNITED STATES CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02444
Date Filed2023-08-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffGOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionGovernment Accountability & Oversight submitted a FOIA request to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for records concerning certain described emails of four named CMS officials using one or more of ten keywords. GAO also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, GAO filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-231COMPLAINT against CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES and US Department of Health and Human Services ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10296546) filed by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 08/23/2023)
2023-08-23Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zrtw) (Entered: 08/23/2023)
2023-08-232SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 08/23/2023)
2023-08-233NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 08/23/2023)
2023-09-204NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie R. Johnson on behalf of UNITED STATES CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/20/2023)
2023-09-225GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 22, 2023. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 09/22/2023)
2023-09-256ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/25/2023)
2023-09-26MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before October 24, 2023, the parties shall file a joint proposed briefing schedule governing further proceedings. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 26, 2023. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 09/26/2023)
2023-09-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 10/24/2023. (zalh) (Entered: 09/26/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar