Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleADVANCE MAGAZINE PUBLISHERS INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02445
Date Filed2023-08-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffADVANCE MAGAZINE PUBLISHERS INC.
Case DescriptionAdvance Magazine Publishers submitted four FOIA requests to the Department of Army for records concerning investigative reports related to war crimes detailed on a second list of incidents. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Advance Magazine Publishers filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-231COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10297208) filed by ADVANCE MAGAZINE PUBLISHERS INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-8, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/23/2023)
2023-08-232NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of ADVANCE MAGAZINE PUBLISHERS INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/23/2023)
2023-08-23Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zljn) (Entered: 08/23/2023)
2023-08-233SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 08/23/2023)
2023-09-204NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Doyle on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY (Doyle, Patrick) (Entered: 09/20/2023)
2023-09-215Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doyle, Patrick) (Entered: 09/21/2023)
2023-09-21MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to the complaint on or before October 25, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/21/2023. (lcrc3) (Entered: 09/21/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar