Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT v. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02462
Date Filed2023-08-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffGOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionGovernment Accountability & Oversight submitted a FOIA request to the SEC for records concerning certain described email correspondence involving four and one SEC officials which was sent to or from named email domains over a specified period of time. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, GAO filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

Defendant2255
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
DefendantSECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-241COMPLAINT against SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10300142) filed by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to US Attorney, # 3 Summons to US Attorney General, # 4 Summons to SEC)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 08/24/2023)
2023-08-242NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 08/24/2023)
2023-08-25Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zcb) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
2023-08-253SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
2023-08-284STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 28, 2023. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 08/28/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar