Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTOTAL ASSET RECOVERY SERVICES LLC v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02469
Date Filed2023-08-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffTOTAL ASSET RECOVERY SERVICES LLC
Case DescriptionTotal Asset Recovery Services submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Commerce for records concerning access to the Social Security Administration's Death Master File. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but told TARS that it had no records connected to the SSA DMF. TARS then filed an administrative appeal to DOC and then submitted a second FOIA request. After hearing nothing from the agency, TARS filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-241COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10301133) filed by TOTAL ASSET RECOVERY SERVICES LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons)(Savage, Zachary) (Entered: 08/24/2023)
2023-08-28NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to ZSavage@susmangodfrey.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsl, ) (Entered: 08/28/2023)
2023-08-282ERRATA by TOTAL ASSET RECOVERY SERVICES LLC re 1 Complaint,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Savage, Zachary) (Entered: 08/28/2023)
2023-08-283REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE U.S. Department of Commerce filed by TOTAL ASSET RECOVERY SERVICES LLC. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by TOTAL ASSET RECOVERY SERVICES LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney's Office, Washington D.C.)(Savage, Zachary) (Entered: 08/28/2023)
2023-08-28Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsl) (Entered: 08/28/2023)
2023-08-304SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) (Entered: 08/30/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar