Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case Title Driggs et. al. v. Central Intelligence Agency
DistrictEastern District of Virginia
CityAlexandria
Case Number1:2023cv01124
Date Filed2023-08-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge T. S. Ellis, III
PlaintiffMichael Driggs
PlaintiffRobert Moore
PlaintiffJana Orear
PlaintiffChristianne O'Malley
PlaintiffThomas Michael Logan
PlaintiffDavid Logan
PlaintiffMegan Marx
PlaintiffTerri Mumley
PlaintiffJohn Zimmerlee
PlaintiffCarol Hrdlicka
PlaintiffGeorge Patterson
PlaintiffMark Sauter
PlaintiffPOW Investigative Project, Inc. A Maryland Corporation
Case DescriptionMichael Driggs and others submitted FOIA requests to the CIA. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Driggs and the others filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Fees, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCentral Intelligence Agency Washington, DC 20505
DefendantPOW Investigative Project, Inc.
DefendantCentral Intelligence Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-241Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-9093316.), filed by David Logan, Jana Orear, Megan Marx, John Zimmerlee, Mark Sauter, Robert Moore, Terri Mumley, Michael Driggs, Christianne OMalley, Carol Hrdlicka, Thomas Michael Logan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA Request, # 2 Affidavit Smith, # 3 Affidavit Shipp, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clarke, John) (Entered: 08/24/2023)
2023-08-242Proposed Summons by Michael Driggs, Carol Hrdlicka, David Logan, Thomas Michael Logan, Megan Marx, Robert Moore, Terri Mumley, Christianne OMalley, Jana Orear, George Patterson, Mark Sauter, John Zimmerlee. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Summons)(Clarke, John) (Entered: 08/24/2023)
2023-08-24Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (wgar, ) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
2023-08-243Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA. (Attachments: # 1 Notice to Attorney)(wgar, ) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
2023-08-25Notice of Correction: The filing user has been notified that a Proposed Summons was not submitted as to defendant - Central Intelligence Agency. (wgar, ) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
2023-08-294Corporate Disclosure Statement by Michael Driggs, Carol Hrdlicka, David Logan, Thomas Michael Logan, Megan Marx, Robert Moore, Terri Mumley, Christianne O'Malley, Jana Orear, POW Investigative Project, Inc., George Patterson, Mark Sauter, John Zimmerlee. (Clarke, John) (Entered: 08/29/2023)
2023-08-295FILED IN ERROR AND REMOVED (nneb, ). (Entered: 08/29/2023)
2023-09-016Proposed Summons by Michael Driggs, Carol Hrdlicka, David Logan, Thomas Michael Logan, Megan Marx, Robert Moore, Terri Mumley, Christianne O'Malley, Jana Orear, POW Investigative Project, Inc., George Patterson, Mark Sauter, John Zimmerlee. (Clarke, John) (Entered: 09/01/2023)
2023-09-067Summons Issued as to Central Intelligence Agency, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: # 1 Notice to Attorney)(nneb) (Entered: 09/06/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar