Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTown of Lac Du Flambeau v. U.S. Department of the Interior et al
DistrictWestern District of Wisconsin
CityMadison
Case Number3:2023cv00582
Date Filed2023-08-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge William M. Conley
PlaintiffTown of Lac Du Flambeau
Case DescriptionThe Town of Lac du Flambeau in Wisconsin submitted 26 FOIA requests to the Bureau of Indian Affairs for records concerning property records on Annie Sunn Lane, which was on a nearby Indian reservation. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency and the Town had some discussions about fees but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Town of Lac du Flambeau filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of the Interior
DefendantBureau of Indian Affairs
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-241COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3295013.), filed by Town of Lac Du Flambeau (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FOIA.gov, # 2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons) (Kowalkowski, Frank) Modified on 8/24/2023: Deleted duplicate parties and addresses. Added exhibit description. Spoke with counsel and assistant. (lak) (Entered: 08/24/2023)
2023-08-252Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Town of Lac Du Flambeau. (Kowalkowski, Frank) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
2023-08-25Case directly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Related cases 23cv355 and 23cv541. (lak) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
2023-08-25Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: NORTC , Corporate Disclosure Statement . (lak) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
2023-08-253Summons Issued as to Defendants. (lak) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
2023-09-054Certificate of Service by Plaintiff Town of Lac Du Flambeau. (Kowalkowski, Frank) (Entered: 09/05/2023)
2023-09-12Action Request: Counsel for plaintiff requested to promptly file proof of service / copy of certified return mail receipts referenced in 4 Certificate of Service. (nln) (Entered: 09/12/2023)
2023-09-135Acknowledgment of Service Executed as to 4 Certificate of Service, Action Request Certified Mail Return Receipts filed by Plaintiff Town of Lac Du Flambeau. (Kowalkowski, Frank) (Entered: 09/13/2023)
2023-09-136Notice of Appearance filed by Hillary Hoffman for Defendants Bureau of Indian Affairs, U.S. Department of the Interior. (Hoffman, Hillary) (Entered: 09/13/2023)
2023-09-277ANSWER by Defendants Bureau of Indian Affairs, U.S. Department of the Interior. (Bianchi, Albert) (Entered: 09/27/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar