Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSoutheastern Legal Foundation, Inc. v. National Archives and Records Administration
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2023cv03819
Date Filed2023-08-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Leigh Martin May
PlaintiffSoutheastern Legal Foundation, Inc.
Case DescriptionSoutheastern Legal Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the National Archives and Records Administration for records concerning emails for Joe Biden while he was vice president for three listed email addresses, which were alleged to have been used by Joe Biden while he was vice president to transmit official information to his son Hunter Biden. SLF also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, SLF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNational Archives and Records Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-281COMPLAINT filed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12844605) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet)(dnb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/28/2023)
2023-08-282Electronic Summons Issued as to National Archives and Records Administration (dnb) (Entered: 08/28/2023)
2023-08-283Electronic Summons Issued as to United States Department of Justice (dnb) (Entered: 08/28/2023)
2023-08-284Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney's Office (dnb) (Entered: 08/28/2023)
2023-08-285STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 8/28/2023. (bnp) (Entered: 08/28/2023)
2023-09-126Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. (Myers, David) (Entered: 09/12/2023)
2023-09-217AFFIDAVIT re 2 Summons Issued as to USA, 3 Summons Issued as to USA, 4 Summons Issued as to USA by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1. NARA Green Card, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2. U.S. Attorney, N.D. Ga. Green Card, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3. U.S. Attorney General Green Card)(Myers, David) (Entered: 09/21/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar