Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEBAN v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02516
Date Filed2023-08-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffKATHERINE EBAN
Case DescriptionKatherine Eban, a contributing editor at Vanity Fair, submitted a FOIA request to the Department for the Army for records concerning Operation Whitecoat. Eban also submitted the request to the National Archives and Records Administration. NARA acknowledged receipt of the request and told Eban responsive records were probably still in the custody of the Army. The Army then acknowledged receipt of the request and told Eban that the records were at NARA but under the custody of the Army. The Army told Eban that it had referred the request to Army Medical Research of Infectious Diseases for response. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, Eban filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantU.S. ARMY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-291COMPLAINT against U.S. ARMY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10311186) filed by KATHERINE EBAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-7, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/29/2023)
2023-08-292NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of KATHERINE EBAN (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/29/2023)
2023-08-293SEALED DOCUMENT filed by KATHERINE EBAN(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/29/2023)
2023-08-29Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zljn) (Entered: 08/29/2023)
2023-08-294SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 08/29/2023)
2023-08-295STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/29/2023. (lctnm2) (Entered: 08/29/2023)
2023-09-266NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Doyle on behalf of U.S. ARMY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Doyle, Patrick) (Entered: 09/26/2023)
2023-09-267Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by U.S. ARMY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doyle, Patrick) (Entered: 09/26/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar