Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMAGASSA v. TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02526
Date Filed2023-08-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffLASSANA MAGASSA an individual residing at
Case DescriptionLassana Magassa submitted a FOIA request to the Transportation Security Administration for records concerning why his Security Identification Display Area badge was revoked by the agency, causing Magassa to lose his job with Delta. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Magassa filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantTRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-291COMPLAINT against TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10312592) filed by LASSANA MAGASSA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons)(Jump, Christina) (Entered: 08/29/2023)
2023-08-292NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by LASSANA MAGASSA. Case related to Case No. 19-cv-1953. (Jump, Christina) (Entered: 08/29/2023)
2023-08-30Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zljn) (Entered: 08/30/2023)
2023-08-303SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 08/30/2023)
2023-08-304Case randomly reassigned to Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. Judge Emmet G. Sullivan is no longer assigned to the case as deemed not related. (ztnr) (Entered: 08/30/2023)
2023-09-215RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/13/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/13/2023. (Jump, Christina) (Entered: 09/21/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar