Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR WATER SECURITY AND COOPERATION v. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02529
Date Filed2023-08-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffCENTER FOR WATER SECURITY AND COOPERATION
Case DescriptionThe Center for Water Security and Cooperation submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning its decisions to allow seven municipalities to disregard their obligations under the Clean Water Act for years. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied most of the request under Exemption 5 (privileges) and Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). CWSC filed an administrative appeal. The agency ruled in favor of CWSC, which resulted in disclosure of 1,048 additional pages. Believing that the agency had not disclosed all responsive records, CWSC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-291COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10312691) filed by CENTER FOR WATER SECURITY AND COOPERATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Savage, Justin) (Entered: 08/29/2023)
2023-08-292LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR WATER SECURITY AND COOPERATION (Savage, Justin) (Entered: 08/29/2023)
2023-08-293MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Maureen M. Crough, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10312793. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR WATER SECURITY AND COOPERATION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Savage, Justin) (Entered: 08/29/2023)
2023-08-294MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nicholas James Maggipinto, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10312803. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR WATER SECURITY AND COOPERATION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Savage, Justin) (Entered: 08/29/2023)
2023-08-295MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Henry Visser Melville, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10312809. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR WATER SECURITY AND COOPERATION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Savage, Justin) (Entered: 08/29/2023)
2023-08-30Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsl) (Entered: 08/30/2023)
2023-08-306SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) (Entered: 08/30/2023)
2023-08-30NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to jsavage@sidley.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. (zsl, ) (Entered: 08/30/2023)
2023-08-307REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to US Attorney General and US Attorney for the District of Columbia filed by CENTER FOR WATER SECURITY AND COOPERATION. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Savage, Justin) (Entered: 08/30/2023)
2023-08-30MINUTE ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Maureen M. Crough is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/30/2023. (lcapm1) (Entered: 08/30/2023)
2023-08-30MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Nicholas James Maggipinto is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/30/2023. (lcapm1) (Entered: 08/30/2023)
2023-08-30MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Henry Visser Melville is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/30/2023. (lcapm1) (Entered: 08/30/2023)
2023-08-318SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (zed) (Entered: 08/31/2023)
2023-09-069NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen M. Crough on behalf of CENTER FOR WATER SECURITY AND COOPERATION (Crough, Maureen) (Entered: 09/06/2023)
2023-09-0610NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Visser Melville on behalf of CENTER FOR WATER SECURITY AND COOPERATION (Melville, Henry) (Entered: 09/06/2023)
2023-09-0611NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas James Maggipinto on behalf of CENTER FOR WATER SECURITY AND COOPERATION (Maggipinto, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/06/2023)
2023-09-2012RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 9/20/2023 (Crough, Maureen) (Entered: 09/20/2023)
2023-09-2013ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 9/6/2023. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 9/27/2023. (Crough, Maureen) Modified on 9/21/2023 (zed). (Entered: 09/20/2023)
2023-09-21NOTICE OF ERROR regarding 13 Summons Returned Executed as to DC Attorney General,. The following error(s) need correction: Incorrect event. Please refile. (zed) (Entered: 09/21/2023)
2023-09-2214RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/6/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/6/2023. (Crough, Maureen) (Entered: 09/22/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar