Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMIR v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02543
Date Filed2023-08-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffHALIL DEMIR
Case DescriptionHajil Demir submitted two FOIA requests to FBI for records concerning himself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency withheld records under Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). Demir filed an administrative appeal with the Office of Information Policy. OIP upheld the FBI's denial. Demir then submitted a FOIA request for his records online. The agency acknowledged receipt of that request and told Demir that it would still invoke Exemption 7(A). Demir filed a second administrative appeal to OIP, which again upheld the FBI's denial. Demir then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-301COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BDCDC-10316502) filed by HALIL DEMIR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Jump, Christina) (Entered: 08/30/2023)
2023-08-31Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zrtw) (Entered: 08/31/2023)
2023-08-312SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 08/31/2023)
2023-09-213RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/14/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/14/2023. (Jump, Christina) (Entered: 09/21/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar