Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Heritage Foundation et al v. U.S. Department of Justice
DistrictDistrict of Delaware
CityWilmington
Case Number1:2023cv00955
Date Filed2023-08-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Maryellen Noreika
PlaintiffThe Heritage Foundation
PlaintiffMike Howell
Case DescriptionThe Heritage Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice and the Office for the U.S. Attorney for the District of Delaware for records concerning its policy of the use of pretrial diversion to Justice Manual 9-22,010. The Heritage Foundation also requested a fee waiver and expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Heritage Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Expedited processing, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-301COMPLAINT and Prayer for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed against U.S. Department of Justice ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4213315.) - filed by The Heritage Foundation, Mike Howell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) (Entered: 08/31/2023)
2023-08-302Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 08/31/2023)
2023-08-303Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Justice, Hon. Merrick Garland on 8/31/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Issued, # 2 Summons Issued)(twk) (Entered: 08/31/2023)
2023-09-06Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 09/06/2023)
2023-09-194First AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Justice- filed by The Heritage Foundation, Mike Howell. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint - Redline, # 2 Exhibit 1 to the Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit 2 to the Amended Complaint, # 4 Exhibit 3 to the Amended Complaint, # 5 Exhibit 4 to the Amended Complaint, # 6 Exhibit 5 to the Amended Complaint, # 7 Exhibit 6 to the Amended Complaint, # 8 Exhibit 7 to the Amended Complaint)(Murray, Julianne) (Entered: 09/19/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar