Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02545
Date Filed2023-08-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffAMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionAmerica First Legal Foundation submitted a FOIA request to FBI for records concerning communications to or from the National Election Command Post referencing the Twitter accounts that were flagged for additional action due to the accounts being utilized to spread misinformation. AFL provided 24 search terms based on the Twitter accounts. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The FBI told AFL that its request was too broad for search purposes. AFL filed an administrative appeal but after hearing nothing further from the agency, AFL filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-311COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10317800) filed by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Ding, Michael) (Entered: 08/31/2023)
2023-08-31Case Assigned to Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zljn) (Entered: 08/31/2023)
2023-08-312SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 08/31/2023)
2023-09-053STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 5, 2023. (lcbah4) (Entered: 09/05/2023)
2023-09-144NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Meckler on behalf of AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION (Meckler, Jacob) (Entered: 09/14/2023)
2023-09-155RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/5/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/5/2023. (Meckler, Jacob) (Entered: 09/15/2023)
2023-09-156RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General Sept. 13, 2023. (Meckler, Jacob) (Entered: 09/15/2023)
2023-09-157RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 9/13/2023 (Meckler, Jacob) (Entered: 09/15/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar