Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleByrne v. National Park Service et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2023cv04512
Date Filed2023-08-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson
PlaintiffPeter Byrne
Case DescriptionPeter Bryne, a journalist, submitted FOIA requests to the National Park Service for records concerning operation and management of the Point Reyes National Seashore. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency disclosed records with redactions in response to several requests and told Bryne that it was working on others. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Bryne filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNational Park Service
DefendantUnited States Department of the Interior
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-311COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief for Violation of the Freedom of Information Act, 5 U.S.C. § 552 et seq. against National Park Service, United States Department of the Interior ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18606704.). Filed by Peter Byrne. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 8/31/2023) Modified on 9/1/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/31/2023)
2023-08-312Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/14/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2023) (Entered: 08/31/2023)
2023-08-313Proposed Summons. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 8/31/2023) (Entered: 08/31/2023)
2023-08-314Certificate of Interested Entities by Peter Byrne (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 8/31/2023) (Entered: 08/31/2023)
2023-09-015NOTICE of Appearance by Shontee M. Pant (Pant, Shontee) (Filed on 9/1/2023) (Entered: 09/01/2023)
2023-09-016Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/30/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2023) (Entered: 09/01/2023)
2023-09-017Summons Issued as to National Park Service, United States Department of the Interior, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2023) (Entered: 09/01/2023)
2023-09-138CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Peter Byrne.. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 9/13/2023) (Entered: 09/13/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar