Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSanders, Thomas v. Bender, Joseph et al
DistrictWestern District of Wisconsin
CityMadison
Case Number3:2023cv00589
Date Filed2023-08-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge James D. Peterson
PlaintiffThomas E. Sanders
Case DescriptionThomas Sanders submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning his criminal investigation. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and issued a Glomar response. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Sanders filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantJoseph E. Bender, Jr.
DefendantPriscilla Jones
DefendantBobak Talebian
E-filing Institution
WSPF Prison Facility
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-08-281COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Thomas E. Sanders. (Attachments: # 1 Certification as to 3 or more dismissals, # 2 Cover Letter) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 08/28/2023)
2023-08-282Declaration of Thomas E. Sanders re: 1 Complaint by Thomas E. Sanders. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 08/28/2023)
2023-08-283Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Thomas E. Sanders. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 08/28/2023)
2023-08-284Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Thomas E. Sanders. (jef),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2023: # 1 IPP Calculation) (jef). (Entered: 08/28/2023)
2023-08-285ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 23.59 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 9/18/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew R. Wiseman on 8/28/2023. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 08/28/2023)
2023-08-306Plaintiff's Motion for a Court Order to Access Release Account by Plaintiff Thomas E. Sanders. (Attachments: # 1 Copy of Notice of Electronic fling (dkt. 5 )) (jls),(ps) (Entered: 08/30/2023)
2023-09-017ORDER directing prison officials to use funds in plaintiff's release account to pay any portion of the initial partial payment that remains after first drawing funds from his regular inmate account. The deadline for plaintiff to pay the initial partial payment is extended to September 29, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew R. Wiseman on 9/1/2023. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 09/01/2023)
2023-09-06Partial Filing fee received: $23.59, receipt number 1569. (jls),(ps) (Entered: 09/06/2023)
2023-09-068Warden PLRA Letter. (jls),(ps) (Entered: 09/06/2023)
2023-09-079JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet re: 1 Complaint filed by Thomas E. Sanders. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 09/07/2023)
2023-09-0710Summonses as to Defendants by Plaintiff Thomas E. Sanders. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 09/07/2023)
2023-09-1111Motion for Leave to File An Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Thomas E. Sanders. (jls),(ps) (Entered: 09/11/2023)
2023-09-1112Motion to Amend 1 Complaint by Plaintiff Thomas E. Sanders. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Summons, # 2 Amended Complaint) (jls),(ps) (Entered: 09/11/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar