Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePRETZMAN v. MAYORKAS et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02577
Date Filed2023-09-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffMINDY PRETZMAN
Case DescriptionMindy Pretzman submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the disclosure of Pretzman's cell phone data, while she served as a Secret Service agent, as part the investigation of the storming of the capitol on January 6, 2021. The agency told Pretzman it considered her request was neither a FOIA nor a Privacy Act request. Pretzman filed an administrative appeal but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Pretzman filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Fees

DefendantALEJANDRO NICHOLAS MAYORKAS in his official capacity as secretary of Homeland Security
DefendantJAMES M. MURRAY in his official capacity as Director, United States Secret Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-09-051COMPLAINT against ALEJANDRO NICHOLAS MAYORKAS, JAMES MICHAEL MURPHY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10325891) filed by Mindy Pretzman. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Berger, Lawrence) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/6/2023) (zljn). (Entered: 09/05/2023)
2023-09-052SEALED DOCUMENT filed by Mindy Pretzman(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Berger, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/05/2023)
2023-09-053CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mindy Pretzman re 2 Sealed Document Notice of Plaintiff's Residence Address . (Berger, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/05/2023)
2023-09-06NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to lberger@lbfedlaw.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Attorney is provisional. Please renew your membership. See https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal., 2. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue., 3. Missing/incorrect summonses. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to issue., 4. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zljn, ) (Entered: 09/06/2023)
2023-09-06RESOLVED...NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mindy Pretzman re 2 Sealed Document Notice of Plaintiff's Residence Address . (Berger, Lawrence), 2 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by Mindy Pretzman(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Berger, Lawrence). Your attorney renewal/government certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 9/13/2023. (zmrl) Modified on 9/6/2023 (zmrl). (Entered: 09/06/2023)
2023-09-064REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by MINDY PRETZMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Berger, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/06/2023)
2023-09-06Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zljn) (Entered: 09/06/2023)
2023-09-065SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 09/06/2023)
2023-09-206RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEJANDRO NICHOLAS MAYORKAS served on 9/13/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certified Mail Receipts, # 2 Certificate of Service Proof of Receipt)(Berger, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/20/2023)
2023-09-207RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JAMES M. MURRAY served on 9/13/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certified Mail Receipts, # 2 Certificate of Service Govt Defendant - Murray)(Berger, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/20/2023)
2023-09-208RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/14/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/14/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certified Mail Receipts, # 2 Certificate of Service US ATTORNEY)(Berger, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/20/2023)
2023-09-209RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/14/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certified Mail Receipts, # 2 Certificate of Service US ATTORNEY GENERAL)(Berger, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/20/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar